Trambitas, Camelia Alexandra (CPSO#: 81844)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Sep 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Sep 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Taunton Health Centre
1290 Keith Ross Court
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone: (905) 721-4300
Fax: (905) 721-6872
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Camelia Trambitas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 22 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Trambitas ( CPSO# 81844 )

Business Address:
Taunton Health Centre
1290 Keith Ross Court
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone Number: (905) 721-4300

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 31 Aug 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAMELIA ALEXANDRA TRAMBITAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRAMBITAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2004 to 23 Nov 2004
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 24 Nov 2004 to 31 Aug 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2005 to 31 Aug 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 2006