Tran, Allen (CPSO#: 104534)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 07 Mar 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Mar 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Alberta, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 30 Jul 2014 to 25 Aug 2014
Elective Trainee - General Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 11 Jan 2017 to 07 Mar 2017
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Aug 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Mar 2017