Tran, Dat Jeffrey (CPSO#: 66759)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Vietnamese

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oregon Health Authority
800 NE Oregon St, Ste 772
Portland OR  97232
United States
Phone: 971-673-1111
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Kid E Care
491 Eglinton Avenue West, Suite 301
Toronto ON  M5N 1A8
Canada
Phone: 416-860-6696
Fax: 416-860-6696
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Oregon

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 07 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAT JEFFREY TRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 5 - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Resident 5 - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1997