Tran, Franklin Thien Vinh (CPSO#: 71080)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
P O Box 63
Suite 104
200 Consilium Place
Toronto ON  M1H 3E4
Phone: (416) 479-8686
Fax: (416) 296-8816
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Franklin Tran Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 12 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Tran ( CPSO# 71080 )

Business Address:
104 - 200 Consilium Place
P.O. Box 63
Toronto ON  M1H 3E4
Phone Number: (416) 479-8686

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British West Indies

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FRANKLIN THIEN VINH TRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002