Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Tran, John Thien An (CPSO#: 63767)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
8080 Parkway Dr.
La Mesa
San Diego CA  91942
United States
Phone: (800) 290-5000

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California
USA - Illinois

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 05 Dec 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN THIEN AN TRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1992