Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Tran, Si Hung (CPSO#: 68819)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Nov 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Nov 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Vietnamese

Education:McGill University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2025 Midland Ave
Suite 300
Scarborough ON  M1P 3E2
Phone: 647-341-3832
Fax: 647-341-3830
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Canada
Phone: (416) 438-2911
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

North Toronto Endoscopy Clinic
7155 Woodbine Avenue
Suite 125
Markham ON  L3R 1A3
Canada
Phone: (905) 946-0222
Fax: (905) 946-0225
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Stanley Tran Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Tran ( CPSO# 68819 )

Business Address:
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Business Address:
125 - 7155 Woodbine Avenue
Markham ON  L3R 1A3
Phone Number: (905) 946-0222

Business Address:
300 - 2025 Midland Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1P 3E2
Phone Number: (647) 341-3832

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 27 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SI HUNG TRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Nov 2000