Tran, Simone My Phuong (CPSO#: 67048)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 13 Jan 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Jan 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 07 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 26 Aug 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Apr 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 29 Apr 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2005