Tran, Tinco (CPSO#: 26001)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 Jun 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Jun 1996

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Vietnamese

Education:University of Saigon, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Centre Hospitalier Lachine
650 16th Avenue
Lachine QC  H8S 3N5
Phone: (514) 637-2351

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1973
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 13 Aug 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Jun 1996

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 24 Oct 1980
Summary:

 In October 1980, Dr. Tran pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 
 60(3)(a) of the Health Disciplines Act, 1974, as amended, in that he had been found guilty of an 
 offence relevant to his suitability to practice.  The Discipline Committee accepted this plea and 
 found Dr. Tran guilty of professional misconduct.  Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. 
 Tran's licence to practice be suspended for a period of one year, but that this penalty be itself 
 suspended without terms or conditions.  The Committee also ruled that Dr. Tran be reprimanded.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 24 Oct 1980