Tran, Van-Chung (CPSO#: 67304)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jan 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jan 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Vietnamese

Education:University of Saigon, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
302 Spadina Avenue
Suite 202
Toronto ON  M5T 2E7
Phone: (416) 977-2864
Fax: (416) 644-5544
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Van-Chung Tran Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 16 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Tran ( CPSO# 67304 )

Business Address:
302 Spadina Avenue
Suite 202
Toronto ON  M5T 2E7
Phone Number: (416) 977-2864

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Dec 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VAN-CHUNG TRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 03 Aug 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Jul 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 1996