Trangmar, Roxanne Shirin LaBelle (CPSO#: 99368)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Dec 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Dec 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sydney, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
East Wellington Family Health Team
Unit 1
6 Thompson Crescent
Erin ON  N0B 1T0
Phone: (519) 833-9396
Fax: (519) 833-9838
Electoral District: 03

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Dec 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROXANNE SHIRIN LABELLE TRANGMAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRANGMAR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 23 Oct 2012 to 15 Jan 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 16 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 20 Nov 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 21 Nov 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 29 Nov 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 30 Nov 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 16 Nov 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Nov 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2015