Trant, Alison Margaret Sutherland (CPSO#: 58374)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Apr 1989


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 309
383 Parkdale Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4R4
Phone: (613) 724-5852
Fax: (613) 724-9965
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alison Trant Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 14 2010

Dr. A. Trant ( CPSO# 58374 )

Business Address:
309 - 383 Parkdale Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4R4
Phone Number: (613) 724-5994


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. ALISON MARGARET SUTHERLAND TRANT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRANT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1987 to 14 Jun 1988
Other - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 1989