Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Trapp, John Baptist Francis (CPSO#: 25297)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Oct 1972

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Oct 1972

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
College medical centre
1 Ballinalee rd , Longford
Co Longford
longford 000 000
Ireland
Phone: 01135343 62714

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN BAPTIST FRANCIS TRAPP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRAPP is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 1972