Treacy, Ronan Barry Conal (CPSO#: 85540)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 20 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Birmingham, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Aug 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Jun 2008