Treasurywala, Katayun (CPSO#: 90879)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Maitland Valley Medical Centre
180 Cambria Road North
Goderich ON  N7A 4N8
Phone: 519-524-6060 Ext. 503
Fax: 519-524-5225
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Alexandra Marine and General
Hospital
120 Napier Street
Goderich ON  N7A 1W5
Canada
Phone: 519-524-8323 Ext. 0
County: County of Huron
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S.S. Gill Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 27 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Treasurywala ( CPSO# 90879 )
Dr. S. Gill ( CPSO# 92805 )

Business Address:
Huron Perth Healthcare Alliance
98 Shipley Street
Clinton ON  N0M 1L0
Phone Number: (519) 482-3440

Business Address:
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital
120 Napier Street
Goderich ON  N7A 1W5
Phone Number: (519) 524-8689

Business Address:
Maitland Valley Medical Centre
180 Cambria Road North
Goderich ON  N7A 4N8
Phone Number: (519) 524-6060

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATAYUN TREASURYWALA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TREASURYWALA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2012