Trecarten, Mark A (CPSO#: 55403)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 May 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Drive
Nepean ON  K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-4710
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1220 Promenade Place d'Orleans
Orleans ON  K1C7K3
Canada
Phone: 6138415389
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M.A. Trecarten Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 03 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Trecarten ( CPSO# 55403 )

Business Address:
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Business Address:
Orleans Urgent Care
1220 Promenade Place D'Orleans
Orleans ON  K1C 7K3
Phone Number: (613) 841-5392

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1987 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1988 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK A TRECARTEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRECARTEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 May 1987