Tregonning, Garnet Donald (CPSO#: 41905)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Otago, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Oct 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1987