Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Treissman, Simon Patrick (CPSO#: 62352)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 10 Sep 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1991
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 28 Oct 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 1995
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Jul 1998