Treloar, Murray Edward (CPSO#: 31297)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jan 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jan 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dynacare
1100 Bennett Road
Bowmanville ON  L1C 3K5
Phone: (905) 926-1002
Fax: (905) 797-2694
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Murray Treloar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 08 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Treloar ( CPSO# 31297 )

Business Address:
Gamma-Dynacare Medical Laboratories
1100 Bennett Road
Bowmanville ON  L1C 3K5
Phone Number: (905) 926-1002

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 20 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MURRAY EDWARD TRELOAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRELOAR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 1980