Tremblay, Lescia Kryworuchko (CPSO#: 84582)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Ukrainian

Education:University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Child Youth Family Program
A3
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 433-4345
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lescia K. Tremblay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Tremblay ( CPSO# 84582 )

Business Address:
Child Youth Family Program
A3
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 433-4345

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LESCIA KRYWORUCHKO TREMBLAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TREMBLAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2012