Tremblay, Pamela Margaret (CPSO#: 50669)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 16 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: Hamer, Pamela Margaret (used until: 19 Jun 1983 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. Tremblay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 15 2013


Corporation Name: Pamela Tremblay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 27 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: Glazier Medical Centre, 11 Gibb Street, Oshawa, ON L1H 2J9
Date Received: 15 Jun 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 24 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jun 2015