Tremblay, Pierre Coursolles (CPSO#: 13709)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:University of Ottawa, 1951

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 22 Nov 1956 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 1952
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Jul 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2002