Tremblay St-Germain, Amelie (CPSO#: 96926)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 24 Oct 2011 to 20 Nov 2011
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Nov 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2015