Trenholm, Ceferina Llacer (CPSO#: 42226)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tagalog

Education:University of Santo Tomas, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 06 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 1969
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jul 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Feb 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Jun 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 1990
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jul 2013