Trepanier, Jean Roland (CPSO#: 31370)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 21 Mar 1984

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medical Expertise Division
Phase IV 6th Floor 6A 125
140 Promenade du Portage
Gatineau QC  K1A 0J9
Phone: (819) 654-2787

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 1980
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Mar 1984
Terms and conditions amended by Fitness to Practise Committee Effective: 14 Mar 2001

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Fitness to Practise Committee Effective: 14 Mar 2001 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Jean R. Trepanier shall not prescribe narcotics or controlled drugs or
            preparations of narcotics and controlled drugs except tablets in dosages that
            contain no more than 30 milligrams of codeine per tablet, which exception
            includes Tylenol 2 and Tylenol 3 tablets which he may prescribe.

Previous Hearings

Committee: Fitness To Practise
Decision Date: 15 Feb 1991
Summary:

 On Feb 15, 1991, the Fitness to Practice Committee found Dr. Trépanier to be an incapacitated 
 member of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario pursuant to clause 62(1)(b) of the 
 Health Disciplines Act.

And, ordered the following terms and conditions imposed on Dr. 
 Trepanier(s licence:

1.	that he be monitored by a colleague, who is acceptable to the Registrar, 
 who shall file yearly reports to the College;
2.	that he undergo treatment with a physician who is 
 familiar with the treatment of substance abuse, and is acceptable to the Registrar, who will 
 monitor and file quarterly reports to the College;
3.	that he continue to attend the Health 
 Professionals Group as long and as frequently as recommended by his treating physician;
4.	that he 
 abstain from consuming narcotic or controlled drugs and the preparation of narcotics or controlled 
 drugs, except as prescribed by his physician;
5.	that he not prescribe narcotics or controlled 
 drugs, nor the preparations of narcotics and controlled drugs.

On March 14, 2001, the Fitness to 
 Practice Committee accepted Dr. Trepanier(s application to vary the terms and conditions as set 
 out above.

The Committee directed:

1. that the Order of February 15, 1991, be rescinded and the 
 following term and condition be              imposed on Dr. Trepanier(s certificate of 
 registration:

2. that Dr. Trepanier not prescribe narcotics or controlled drugs nor preparations 
 of narcotics and      controlled drugs except for Tylenol 2 and Tylenol 3;

3. either party may 
 move before the Committee to vary or terminate the terms of this Order.

Appeal: No Appeal