Trickey, Brian Hazen (CPSO#: 29328)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 18 Apr 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
945 Gardiners Road
Kingston ON  K7M 7H4
Phone: (613) 389-3348
Fax: (613) 389-6615
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brian Trickey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 17 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Trickey ( CPSO# 29328 )

Business Address:
945 Gardiners Road
Kingston ON  K7M 7H4
Phone Number: (613) 389-3348

Medical Records Location

Address: DocuDavit Solutions 28 Eugene Street Toronto, Ontario M6B 3Z4 Tel: (416) 781-9083 Toll Free: 1-888-781-9083 Fax: 1-866-297-9338 Website: http://www.docudavit.com
Date Received: 01 Jun 2011

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Apr 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 18 Apr 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 18 Apr 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from April 18, 2017, the following terms, conditions and limitations are
            imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Brian Hazen Trickey, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Trickey to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:


                       UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT ("Undertaking")

                                                  of

                                   DR. BRIAN TRICKEY ("Dr. Trickey")

                                                  to

                     COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (the "College")



            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the
                  Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended;
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the
                  College;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Trickey, certificate of registration number 29328, am a member of
                  the
                  College.  The College has received information regarding my standard of
                  practice.
                  
            (3)   I, Dr. Trickey, acknowledge that the College received information about
                  my standard of practice through a reassessment dated June 8, 2016.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Trickey, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.

            (5)   Clinical Supervision

                  (a)   I, Dr. Trickey, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), for six (6) months ("Clinical Supervision").

                  (b)   I,   Dr.   Trickey,   acknowledge   that   I   have   reviewed
                        the   Clinical Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as
                        Appendix "A", and understand what is required of the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s). The Clinical Supervisor(s) will, at minimum:
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate  the  education  program  set  out  in  the
                              Individualized
                              Education Plan ("IEP"), attached hereto as Appendix "B";
                  
                        (ii)  Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location
                              approved by the College, once every two weeks for two months
                              and thereafter further to the recommendation of the Clinical
                              Supervisor and the approval of the College, once a month;
                  
                        (iii) Review at least fifteen (15) of my patient charts at every
                              meeting; (iv)Directly observe my interactions with patients
                              for a half day for the
                              first four visits;
                  
                        (v)   Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (vi)  Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations;
                  
                        (vii) Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (viii)Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              month for two months and quarterly thereafter, or more
                              frequently if the Clinical Supervisor(s) has concerns about
                              my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Trickey, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the educational
                        needs identified in the IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B", as
                        well as the areas of concern identified in the report(s) of the
                        assessor dated June 8, 2016., and concerns that may arise during
                        the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Trickey, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, and to abide by
                        the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  

                  (e)   I, Dr. Trickey, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Trickey, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Trickey, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (5)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Trickey, acknowledge that if I am required to cease practise
                        as a result of section (5)(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (6)   Professional Education

                  (a)   I, Dr. Trickey, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as
                        Appendix "B", including all of the following professional education
                        (the "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   a program(s) satisfactory to the College in: medical record
                              keeping;
                              and
                  
                        (ii)  any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical
                              Supervisor(s).
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Trickey, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that
                        the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Trickey, acknowledge that a report or reports may be
                        provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with
                        the Professional Education.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Trickey, undertake to complete this requirement within six
                        months or, if no satisfactory program is available by that time, by
                        the first possible opportunity thereafter.

            (7)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Trickey, undertake that, approximately twelve (12) months
                        after the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section
                        (3) above and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, I will submit to a
                        reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or
                        assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor(s)").  I
                        acknowledge that the Reassessment may include a chart review,
                        direct observation of my care, interviews with colleagues and
                        co-workers, feedback from patients and any other tools deemed
                        necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Trickey, undertake to co-operate fully with the
                        Reassessment, conducted under the term of this Undertaking   and to
                        abide by those recommendations of the Assessor(s) that are approved
                        by the ICR Committee.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Trickey, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor(s) may
                        receive and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may discuss
                        with the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from the
                        Reassessment.  I also acknowledge that the results of the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the report may form the basis of further action by the College.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Trickey, acknowledge that if I am of the view that any of
                        the Assessor(s)'s recommendations are unreasonable, I will have
                        thirty (30) days following my receipt of the recommendations within
                        which to provide the College with my submissions in this regard.  I
                        further acknowledge that thereafter, the ICR Committee will
                        consider my submissions and make a determination regarding whether
                        or not the recommendations, or any of them, are reasonable and if
                        so, whether they, or any of them, constitute limitations or
                        restrictions on my practice, and that decision will be provided to
                        me.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Trickey, undertake that, following the decision referenced
                        in section (8)(d) above, I will abide by those recommendations of
                        the Assessor(s) that the ICR Committee has determined are
                        reasonable.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Trickey, hereby consent to any of the following being
                        included on the public register as terms, conditions or limitations
                        on my certificate of registration, for the purposes of section 23
                        of the Code:
                  
                        (i)   any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which are terms,
                              conditions or limitations on my practice;

                        (ii)  any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which the ICR
                              Committee has identified in its decision referenced in
                              section (7)(d) as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                              practice.
                  
            (8)   Monitoring

                  (a)   I, Dr. Trickey, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five
                        (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further
                        undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Trickey, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s) and
                        patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Trickey, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP, and/or any person who or institution
                        that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
                        monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Trickey, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                        form, attached hereto as Appendix "C".
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (9)   I, Dr. Trickey, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this
                  Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.
                  
            (10)  I, Dr. Trickey, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking.

            (11)  I, Dr. Trickey, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (12)  I, Dr. Trickey, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (13)  I,  Dr. Trickey, acknowledge  that  a  breach  by  me  of  any  provision
                  of  this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence,
                  and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline
                  Committee of the College.


            (14)  I, Dr. Trickey, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code.

            (15)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Trickey, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Trickey, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (16)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              The College received information about Dr. Trickey's standard
                              of practice through a reassessment. As a result of the
                              reassesment:
                  
                                    *     Dr. Trickey will practise under the guidance of a
                                          Clinical
                                          Supervisor acceptable to the College for 6months.
                                    *     Dr. Trickey will engage in professional education
                                          in record keeping.
                                    *     Dr. Trickey's practice will be reassessed by an
                                          assessor selected by the College within 12 months
                                          of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (16)  I, Dr. Trickey, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and
                  to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this
                        Undertaking.

            (17)  I, Dr. Trickey, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.


            (18)  I, Dr. Trickey, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate
                  my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Clinical
                  Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College,
                  and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at
                        Appendix "A" to this Undertaking; 
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant  for  the  purposes  of  monitoring  my  compliance  with
                        this
                        Undertaking; and/or
                  
                  (e)   which comes to their attention in the course of providing the
                        Professional Education and which they reasonably believes indicates
                        a potential risk of harm to my patients.
                  
                  

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: April 18, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Brian Hazen Trickey to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario effective April 18, 2017:

The College received information about Dr. Trickey’s standard of practice through a reassessment. As a result of the reassesment:

Dr. Trickey will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 6months.

Dr. Trickey will engage in professional education in record keeping.

Dr. Trickey’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 12 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.