Trigazis, Leonidas (CPSO#: 77997)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jan 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jan 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 105
170 McEwan Drive East
Bolton ON  L7E 4C8
Phone: (905) 857-3260
Fax: (905) 857-6276
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Headwaters Walk In Clinic
170 Lakeview Crt
Unit #2
Orangeville ON  L9W 5J7
Canada
Phone: (519) 307-1201
Fax: (519) 307-1304
County: County of Dufferin
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. Trigazis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 06 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Trigazis ( CPSO# 77997 )

Business Address:
Suite 105
170 McEwan Drive East
Bolton ON  L7E 4C8
Phone Number: (905) 857-3260

Business Address:
Headwaters Walk-In Clinic
Unit 2
170 Lakeview Court
Orangeville ON  L9W 5J7
Phone Number: (519) 307-1201

Business Address:
9 - 225 The East Mall
Toronto ON  M9B 6J1
Phone Number: (416) 231-7743

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LEONIDAS TRIGAZIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRIGAZIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2006