Trimble, Malcolm Stephen (CPSO#: 53859)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Aug 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1100 East Michigan Avenue
Suite 307
Jackson MI  49201
United States
Phone: (517) 205-1594
Fax: (517) 205-1540

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 22 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MALCOLM STEPHEN TRIMBLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRIMBLE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 1985