Trinh, Khiet Yen (CPSO#: 63708)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Aug 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, Vietnamese

Education:McMaster University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 303
2189 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4S 2B2
Phone: (416) 481-7720
Fax: (416) 481-9903
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K.Y. Trinh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Trinh ( CPSO# 63708 )

Business Address:
303 - 2189 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4S 2B2
Phone Number: (416) 481-7720

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KHIET YEN TRINH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRINH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1993