Trinh, Vivian (CPSO#: 107778)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Nov 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Nov 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1101 Kingston Road Suite 220
Pickering ON  L1V 1B5
Phone: 9058319797 Ext. 3
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Oct 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VIVIAN TRINH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRINH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 05 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 23 Aug 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 24 Aug 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 09 Oct 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Oct 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2017