Trinkaus, Martina Andrea (CPSO#: 81053)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Room 2 084 Queen Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5632
Fax: (416) 864-3055
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Martina Trinkaus Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 11 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Trinkaus ( CPSO# 81053 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
2nd Floor, Rm 2-084, Queen Wing
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5632

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 16 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARTINA ANDREA TRINKAUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRINKAUS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008