Tripodi, Deanna (CPSO#: 83572)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
150 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 6K9
Phone: (519) 824-1010
Electoral District: 03

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 26 Oct 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEANNA TRIPODI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRIPODI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 08 Aug 2005 to 26 Aug 2005
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Aug 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2016