Trivedi, Vatsal (CPSO#: 106143)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Aug 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 29 Aug 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Anesthesiology
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 737-8187
Electoral District: 07

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Aug 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 29 Aug 2017 Active View Details [+]
            Practice Within the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (1)   Dr.   Vatsal   Trivedi   shall  practise  medicine  as  required  by  the
                  postgraduate medical education  program  in which Dr. Trivedi is enrolled
                  at the University of Ottawa.

            (2)   In Dr. Trivedi's practice in the postgraduate  medical education program,
                  Dr. Trivedi shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of
                  a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated  with the department
                  where   Dr.  Trivedi  is  properly  practising  medicine  and  to   which
                  postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of
                  its program of postgraduate medical education.

            (3)   In Dr. Trivedi's  practice in the postgraduate medical education program,
                  Dr. Trivedi shall not charge a fee for medical services.

            Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (4)   Dr. Trivedi may practise  medicine  in the intensive care unit and to the
                  extent  of his employment at the University  of  Ottawa  Heart  Institute
                  Ottawa, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to
                  the College.

            (5)   In Dr. Trivedi's practice specified in paragraph (4), Dr. Trivedi may not
                  charge a fee for medical services.

            Expiry of Certificate

            (6)   This certificate  of registration expires, and Dr. Trivedi must thereupon
                  cease all practice both in and outside the postgraduate medical education
                  program, on the earlier of the following times:

                  (a)   when Dr. Trivedi is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate
                        medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or
                  
                  (b)   when Dr. Trivedi  no  longer  holds Canadian citizenship, permanent
                        resident  status,  or a valid employment  authorization  under  the
                        Immigration Act (Canada).
                  
            Termination of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (7)   This  certificate  automatically   converts  to  a  regular  Postgraduate
                  Education  certificate  and  Dr.   Trivedi  must  immediately  cease  all
                  practice outside the postgraduate medical education program if any one of
                  the following occurs:

                  (a)   the supervisor identified in paragraph  (4) notifies the College of
                        any concerns regarding Dr. Trivedi's practice,  including  but  not
                        limited   to  concerns  regarding  knowledge,  skill,  judgment  or
                        attitude;
                  
                  (b)   the supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing  to  continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Trivedi's practice;
                  
                  (c)   the Postgraduate Dean informs the College that the medical school's
                        approval  for  Dr.   Trivedi  to  engage  in  practice  outside the
                        postgraduate medical education program has been withdrawn;
                  
                  (d)   when Dr. Trivedi's employment as specified in paragraph (4) ceases;
                        or
                  
                  (e)   if  Dr.  Trivedi takes a leave of absence, or transfers to  another
                        program, from  the  postgraduate  education  program  specified  in
                        paragraph (1).
                  
            Resumption of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (8)   In   the   event  of  conversion  to  a  regular  Postgraduate  Education
                  certificate  under  paragraph  (7)  or  expiry  of  the certificate under
                  paragraph  (7),  Dr.  Trivedi  may  not resume any practice  outside  the
                  postgraduate medical education program  under the restricted registration
                  for residents policy until Dr. Trivedi applies  for  a new certificate of
                  registration and obtains approval by the Registration Committee.



            Note: This  certificate  is  issued  on  August  29, 2017.  In accordance  with
                  paragraph  6(a), this certificate of registration  expires  on  June  30,
                  2018.  All practice must cease on that date.

                  Practice  outside   the   postgraduate  medical  education  program  must
                  immediately cease upon any of the events in paragraph 7.