Trojanowska, Elizabeth Marie (CPSO#: 56206)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Wroclaw, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
34 Main Street
Markham ON  L3R 4Z8
Phone: (905) 947 9900
Fax: 905 413 7557
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Trojanowska Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 16 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Trojanowska ( CPSO# 56206 )

Business Address:
34 Main Street
Markham ON  L3R 4Z8
Phone Number: (905) 947-9900

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients seeking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact DocuDavit Solutions by telephone at: 1-888-781-9083, or by fax at: 1-866-297-9338.
Date Received: 09 Jun 2016

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELIZABETH MARIE TROJANOWSKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TROJANOWSKA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1990