Tromp, Margaret Mary (CPSO#: 58735)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 24 May 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Picton Clinic
Suite 5C
389 Main Street East
Picton ON  K0K 2T0
Phone: (613) 476-7870
Fax: (613) 476-6482
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Beach & Tromp Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 12 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Tromp ( CPSO# 58735 )
Dr. D. Beach ( CPSO# 33300 )

Business Address:
Picton Clinic
389 Main Street
Suite 5C
Picton ON  K0K 2T0
Phone Number: (613) 476-7870

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  August 8, 2012
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On August 31, 2012, Quinte Health Care notified the College that the anaesthesia component of Dr. Margaret Mary Tromp's General Practitioner Anaesthesia privileges was suspended, effective August 8, 2012.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1987 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 May 2013
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 05 Sep 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 05 Sep 2014 Active View Details [+]
            As from September 5, 2014, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Margaret Mary Tromp,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Tromp to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Pursuant to her undertaking with the College, Dr. Tromp shall not engage
                  in the practice of anaesthesia in Ontario with the exception of providing
                  procedural sedation, airway management and resuscitation for patients
                  registered in the Emergency Department of a hospital or the initial
                  airway management and resuscitation of patients who acutely decompensate
                  in hospital or outside of hospital.  Dr. Tromp shall not be the Most
                  Responsible Physician for any hospital in-patient requiring ongoing
                  ventilation or resuscitation.