Tron, Victor Alexander (CPSO#: 52007)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Mar 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Mar 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
Cardinal Carter Wing
Room 2-040b
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: 4163604000
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Victor A. Tron Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 21 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Tron ( CPSO# 52007 )

Business Address:
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Business Address:
100 International Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9W 6J6
Phone Number: (416) 675-4530

Business Address:
30 Bond Street
CC Wing Room 2-040b
Toronto ON  M5H 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5313

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 09 Dec 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VICTOR ALEXANDER TRON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 14 Jun 1982 to 13 Jun 1983
Resident 1 - Rotating Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Clinical Fellow - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 2007