Trop, Sebastien (CPSO#: 87281)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (416) 494-2120
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Trillium Health Centre
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Canada
Phone: (416) 259-6671
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sebastien Trop Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 09 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Trop ( CPSO# 87281 )

Business Address:
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 747-3400

Business Address:
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 747-3400

Business Address:
Trillium Health Centre
100 The Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SEBASTIEN TROP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TROP is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 8 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007