Troppmann, Leticia Ann (CPSO#: 82502)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Apr 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Heart Institute
The Ottawa Hospital
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 696-7000
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Dec 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LETICIA ANN TROPPMANN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TROPPMANN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 18 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 19 Dec 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 09 Mar 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 10 Mar 2008 to 22 Jan 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Jan 2009 to 14 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 15 Dec 2009 to 14 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Ottawa, 15 Dec 2010 to 14 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 2011