Troscianczuk, Joanna Ewa (CPSO#: 102081)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Sep 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Sep 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:University of Queensland, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Tottenham Medical Centre
119 Queen St. North
Tottenham ON  L0G 1W0
Phone: (905) 936-4211
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Troscianczuk Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 27 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Troscianczuk ( CPSO# 102081)

Business Address:
119 Queen Street North
Tottenham ON  L0G 1W0
Phone Number: (905) 936-4211

Business Address:
3276 St Clair Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1L 1W1
Phone Number: (416) 285-3666

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Australia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Providence Health Care,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 28 Sep 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOANNA EWA TROSCIANCZUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TROSCIANCZUK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 30 Sep 2013 to 22 Dec 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 29 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 30 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 29 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2015