Trott, Jeffrey Neil (CPSO#: 52909)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Trott Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 14 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Trott ( CPSO# 52909 )

Business Address:
212 - 99 Sinclair Avenue
Georgetown ON  L7G 5G1
Phone Number: (905) 877-1771

Medical Records Location

Address: Suite 212 99 Sinclair Avenue Georgetown ON L7G 5G1
Date Received: 22 Nov 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 22 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFREY NEIL TROTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TROTT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985