Trottier, Alain Jean (CPSO#: 26779)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Jun 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1974
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 05 Nov 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jun 1998