Troyanov, Stephan (CPSO#: 78816)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: French

Education:University of Montreal, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 12 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Mar 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 2004