Trozzi, Mark Raymond (CPSO#: 62778)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Apr 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Apr 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Quinte Healthcare Corporation
North Hastings Site
1 Manor Ln
Bancroft ON  K0L 1C0
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

7 Saint Francis Memorial Drive
Barrys Bay ON  K0J 1B0
Canada
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07

705 MacKay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1E8
Canada
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07

7199 Gelert Rd Box 115
Haliburton ON  K0M1S0
Canada
County: County of Haliburton
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Trozzi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 29 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Trozzi ( CPSO# 62778 )

Business Address:
Quinte Health Care North Hastings
1 H Manor Lane
Bancroft ON  K0L 1C0
Phone Number: (613) 332-2825

Business Address:
7 St Francis Memorial Drive
Box 129
Barrys Bay ON  K0S 1B0
Phone Number: (613) 756-3045

Business Address:
705 Mackay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Phone Number: (613) 732-2811

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Haliburton Highlands Health Services,Haliburton Site Haliburton
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
Quinte Healthcare North Hastings,Bancroft Bancroft
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barrys Bay

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK RAYMOND TROZZI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TROZZI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Mar 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 1992