Trudeau, Maureen Elizabeth (CPSO#: 52006)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Odette Cancer Centre
Room T2-144
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4616
Fax: (416) 480-6002
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maureen Trudeau Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 06 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Trudeau ( CPSO# 52006 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Odette Cancer Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Suite T2-144
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5145

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 04 Sep 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAUREEN ELIZABETH TRUDEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRUDEAU is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1985