Trudel, Michel Antoine (CPSO#: 43963)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 14 May 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 May 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 08 Dec 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 May 2004