Trudel, Suzanne Marie (CPSO#: 68194)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Aug 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Ave
Dept of Medical Oncology and
Haematology
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-4566
Fax: (416) 946-4563
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Suzanne Trudel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 02 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Trudel ( CPSO# 68194 )

Business Address:
Suite 5-110
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-4566

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 18 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUZANNE MARIE TRUDEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRUDEL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1998