Truong, Tony Hung (CPSO#: 78097)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Vietnamese

Education:University of Calgary, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012