Truong, Wayne (CPSO#: 88454)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 19 Oct 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 19 Oct 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Alberta, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 15 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Paediatric Surgery Effective: 28 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Jun 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 22 Sep 2008 to 19 Oct 2008
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Oct 2008