Trus, Michola Rommane (CPSO#: 64193)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Hospital & Cancer Centre
F2 Room 203
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 527-4322
Fax: (905) 575-2553
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 31 Dec 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHOLA ROMMANE TRUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRUS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Dec 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
Resident 5 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1991