Trus, Thadeus Leo (CPSO#: 59845)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 09 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 08 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1989
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Aug 2008