Trussler, Brian Clare (CPSO#: 65543)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Regional Health
Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6000
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Trussler Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 04 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Trussler ( CPSO# 65543 )

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 18 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN CLARE TRUSSLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRUSSLER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1993